LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB995
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB995
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB995
Compare Versions
AB995 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB995 Amended August 16, 2016
AB995 Amended June 30, 2016
AB995 Amended April 29, 2015
AB995 Amended April 23, 2015
AB995 Amended March 26, 2015
AB995 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB995 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB995 Amended August 16, 2016
AB995 Amended June 30, 2016
AB995 Amended April 29, 2015
AB995 Amended April 23, 2015
AB995 Amended March 26, 2015
AB995 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare