LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ABX126
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ABX126
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ABX126
Action History
Assembly
11/30/2016
From committee without further action.
Assembly
08/31/2016
Re-referred to Com. on T. & I.D.
Assembly
08/30/2016
Referred to Com. on T. & I.D. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on T. & I.D. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
08/25/2016
From printer.
Assembly
08/24/2016
Read first time. To print.