Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Died in Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/24/2015
|
Senators Beall (Co-Chair), Allen, Leyva, Cannella, and Gaines appointed to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2015
|
Assembly Members Gomez (Co-Chair), Burke, Melendez, Mullin, and Obernolte appointed to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. To Conference Committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 50. Page 81.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 68.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 65.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 29. Page 57.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Without reference to committee. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 53.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2015
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|