|
03/01/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2015-16 Second Extraordinary Session.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Senate adopted Conference Committee report. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 94.) Assembly adopts Conference Committee report. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 162.). Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2016
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
From Conference Committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 10 (Assembly Members Bonta, Bonilla, Gallagher, Patterson, and Santiago) (Senators Hernandez, Anderson, Leno, Mitchell, and Nielsen)). (Noes 0). To print.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2016
|
Senator Anderson appointed to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/24/2015
|
Senators Hernandez (Co-Chair), Leno, Mitchell, Nielsen, and vacancy appointed to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2015
|
Assembly Members Bonta (Co-Chair), Bonilla, Gallagher, Patterson, and Santiago appointed to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 95.) Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. To Conference Committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 50. Page 96.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 73.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 66.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 58.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Without reference to committee. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 51.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|