LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ABX211
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ABX211
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ABX211
Action History
Assembly
09/10/2015
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Assembly
09/09/2015
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (September 8).
Assembly
08/26/2015
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on FINANCE. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (August 25). Re-referred to Com. on FINANCE.
Assembly
08/20/2015
Referred to Com. on P.H. & D.S.
Assembly
07/17/2015
From printer.
Assembly
07/16/2015
Read first time. To print.