|
10/05/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2015-16 Second Extraordinary Session.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 81.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 72.) Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 35. Page 85.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on FINANCE. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (September 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on FINANCE. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on FINANCE. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on FINANCE. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Referred to Com. on P.H. & D.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2015
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|