Senate | 03/14/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 09/03/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 58.) | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2015 | Without reference to committee. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 51.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 07/06/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2015 | Read first time. To print. |