LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ABX24
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ABX24
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ABX24
Action History
Assembly
03/15/2016
From committee without further action.
Assembly
09/01/2015
Re-referred to Com. on P.H. & D.S.
Assembly
08/31/2015
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.H. & D.S. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
08/27/2015
Referred to Com. on P.H. & D.S.
Assembly
07/17/2015
From printer.
Assembly
07/16/2015
Read first time. To print.