Assembly | 11/30/2016 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2015 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Mullin. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2015 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2015 | Read first time. To print. |