LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACA3
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACA3
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACA3
Action History
Assembly
11/30/2016
From committee without further action.
Assembly
06/24/2015
In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Assembly
05/05/2015
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
04/06/2015
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
Assembly
02/27/2015
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
Assembly
02/26/2015
Read first time. To print.