Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2015 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 07/16/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 07/14/2015 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2015 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS., REV. & TAX. and APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |