LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACA5
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACA5
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACA5
Action History
Assembly
11/30/2016
From committee without further action.
Assembly
05/04/2015
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Assembly
04/30/2015
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
03/26/2015
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Assembly
03/12/2015
From printer. May be heard in committee April 11.
Assembly
03/11/2015
Read first time. To print.