California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR1 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill June 29, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 1, 2015

Amended

Bill April 23, 2015
Bill March 12, 2015