BILL NUMBER: ACR 10CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 62 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 16, 2015 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 11, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 18, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 18, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 22, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Rodriguez (Coauthors: Assembly Members Travis Allen, Baker, Brough, Calderon, Chvez, Cooley, Dodd, Gonzalez, Lackey, Lopez, Mathis, Patterson, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Waldron, Williams, Achadjian, Alejo, Atkins, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonilla, Bonta, Brown, Burke, Campos, Chang, Chau, Chiu, Chu, Cooper, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Frazier, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gatto, Gipson, Gomez, Gordon, Grove, Hadley, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones, Jones-Sawyer, Levine, Linder, Low, Maienschein, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Mullin, Nazarian, Obernolte, O'Donnell, Olsen, Perea, Quirk, Rendon, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Wagner, Weber, Wilk, and Wood) (Coauthors: Senators Allen, Anderson, Bates, Block, Hall, Jackson, Leno, Monning, Nielsen, Pavley, Stone, Vidak, and Wieckowski) JANUARY 21, 2015 Relative to emergency medical services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 10, Rodriguez. Emergency Medical Services Week. This measure would proclaim the week of May 17, 2015, to May 23, 2015, inclusive, as Emergency Medical Services Week. WHEREAS, It is estimated that there are over 840,000 emergency medical services personnel in the United States, including over 80,000 in the State of California; and WHEREAS, Emergency medical services are a vital public service and the members of emergency medical services teams are ready to provide lifesaving care to those in need 24 hours a day, seven days a week; and WHEREAS, The emergency medical services system consists of emergency physicians, emergency nurses, emergency medical technicians, paramedics, firefighters, educators, administrators, and others; and WHEREAS, The members of emergency medical services teams, whether career or volunteer, engage in thousands of hours of specialized training and continuing education to enhance their lifesaving skills; and WHEREAS, Emergency medical services providers are dedicated to saving lives and possess a sense of duty to aid others that is inherent in the profession and stays with an emergency medical services provider for life; and WHEREAS, Approximately 25 to 30 million patients nationwide and over two million patients throughout California receive emergency medical services each year; and WHEREAS, Access to quality emergency medical care dramatically improves the survival and recovery rates of those who experience sudden illness or injury; and WHEREAS, The American College of Emergency Physicians was instrumental in establishing National Emergency Medical Services Week to honor the lifesaving efforts of emergency medical services personnel; and WHEREAS, President Gerald Ford proclaimed the first Emergency Medical Services Week in November of 1974; and WHEREAS, This is the 41st anniversary of National Emergency Medical Services Week; and WHEREAS, The theme of Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Week is "EMS STRONG"; and WHEREAS, It is appropriate to recognize the value and accomplishments of emergency medical services personnel by designating Emergency Medical Services Week in California; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims the week of May 17, 2015, to May 23, 2015, inclusive, as Emergency Medical Services Week in California; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.