Assembly | 09/25/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 201, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 09/25/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/10/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/10/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2706.) | ||
Senate | 09/09/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 09/08/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2948.) | ||
Assembly | 09/04/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 4). | ||
Assembly | 09/01/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2015 | Introduced. To print. |