LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR108
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR108
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR108
Compare Versions
ACR108 Chaptered March 17, 2016
ACR108 Enrolled March 10, 2016
ACR108 Amended February 23, 2016
ACR108 Amended January 19, 2016
ACR108 Introduced January 4, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
ACR108 Chaptered March 17, 2016
ACR108 Enrolled March 10, 2016
ACR108 Amended February 23, 2016
ACR108 Amended January 19, 2016
ACR108 Introduced January 4, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare