Assembly | 03/03/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 7, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3132.) | ||
Senate | 02/24/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3620.) | ||
Assembly | 01/21/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 21). | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2016 | Introduced. To print. |