Assembly | 08/05/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 97, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/02/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4725.) | ||
Senate | 06/15/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4231.) | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 5). | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2016 | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |