Assembly | 06/01/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 54, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3963.) | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4690.) | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 3). | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/21/2016 | Introduced. To print. |