Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4265.) | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2016 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2016 | Introduced. To print. |