Assembly | 08/16/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4875.) | ||
Senate | 08/02/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2016 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4265.) | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2016 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2016 | Introduced. To print. |