Assembly | 09/07/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5482.) | ||
Senate | 08/18/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/09/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5745.) | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 4). | ||
Assembly | 08/02/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/01/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2016 | Introduced. To print. |