LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR137
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR137
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR137
Action History
Assembly
04/28/2016
Read and amended. (Page 4566.) Read. Refused adoption. (Ayes 36. Noes 19. Page 4598.)
Assembly
04/25/2016
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25).
Assembly
03/03/2016
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Assembly
02/12/2016
From printer.
Assembly
02/11/2016
Introduced. To print.