Assembly
|
07/21/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/21/2015
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2316.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1789.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1016.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2015
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|