Assembly | 07/11/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 84, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 07/11/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4648.) | ||
Senate | 06/21/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2016 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2016 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2016 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4503.) | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20). | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2016 | Introduced. To print. |