LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR145
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR145
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR145
Action History
Assembly
11/30/2016
From committee without further action.
Assembly
03/30/2016
In committee: Refused adoption.
Assembly
03/08/2016
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
Assembly
03/01/2016
From printer.
Assembly
02/29/2016
Introduced. To print.