Assembly | 05/05/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3739.) | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4227.) | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29). | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2016 | Introduced. To print. |