Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6049.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4987.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4725.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2016
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|