Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2016 | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2016 | Introduced. To print. |