Assembly | 09/07/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 173, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/25/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5413.) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4125.) | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 28). | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2016 | Introduced. To print. |