Assembly | 08/25/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/18/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5129.) | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4261.) | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 4). | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | Introduced. To print. |