California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR156 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/01/2016

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 156CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 55 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 1, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 26, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Low (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Travis Allen, Arambula, Atkins, Baker, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonta, Brown, Burke, Calderon, Campos, Chang, Chau, Chvez, Chiu, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Dodd, Eggman, Frazier, Beth Gaines, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gatto, Gipson, Gomez, Gonzalez, Gordon, Gray, Grove, Hadley, Harper, Roger Hernndez, Holden, Jones, Jones-Sawyer, Kim, Lackey, Linder, Lopez, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Medina, Mullin, Obernolte, O'Donnell, Olsen, Patterson, Quirk, Rendon, Ridley-Thomas, Rodriguez, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Wagner, Waldron, Weber, Wilk, Williams, and Wood) MARCH 28, 2016 Relative to hemophilia. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 156, Low. World Hemophilia Day. This measure would recognize April 17, 2016, as World Hemophilia Day. WHEREAS, Hemophilia is a rare genetic bleeding disorder in which one of the proteins that causes blood to clot is missing, or there is not enough of the protein to work properly, causing people to bleed longer; and WHEREAS, Without effective blood clotting, cuts and internal injuries have difficulty healing and internal bleeding into the joints can result in pain and permanent damage; and WHEREAS, Hemophilia is typically a lifelong condition that is primarily treated with infusions of a protein involved in blood clotting; and WHEREAS, It is estimated that more than 400,000 people worldwide are living with hemophilia; and WHEREAS, Approximately 20,000 people in the United States are living with hemophilia; and WHEREAS, Hemophilia is found in all populations; and WHEREAS, People living with hemophilia and those caring for and serving them are strongly united in advocating for access to treatment and care; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes April 17, 2016, as World Hemophilia Day; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.