Assembly | 08/25/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5158.) | ||
Senate | 08/15/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 08/09/2016 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/03/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/01/2016 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5643.) | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29). | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2016 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2016 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | Introduced. To print. |