BILL NUMBER: ACR 159CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 123 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 16, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 11, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 16, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Salas MARCH 29, 2016 Relative to the CHP Officer Keith M. Giles Memorial Interchange. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 159, Salas. CHP Officer Keith M. Giles Memorial Interchange. This measure would designate the interchange at State Routes 43 and 198 in the County of Kings as the CHP Officer Keith M. Giles Memorial Interchange. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost for appropriate signs, including the star of the Department of the California Highway Patrol, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Keith Melvin Giles was born on July 21, 1940, to Melvin and Thelma Giles, in Tulare, California; and WHEREAS, Keith Giles had three siblings: Gary, who was Keith's twin brother, Linda, and Greg; and WHEREAS, Keith Giles graduated from Corcoran High School in 1957, graduated from the College of the Sequoias shortly thereafter, and also attended Fresno State College; and WHEREAS, Keith Giles proudly served in the United States Army from 1963 to 1965 and achieved the rank of corporal; and WHEREAS, Keith Giles married his best friend, Wilma, on March 7, 1964, and had three wonderful children: Karen, born March 5, 1967, Kelly, born October 20, 1969, and Darren, born November 5, 1973; and WHEREAS, Prior to becoming a California Highway Patrol officer, Keith Giles worked as a farmer and was actively involved in the community; and WHEREAS, Officer Giles graduated from the California Highway Patrol Academy on May 28, 1970, with CTC I-70 and, upon graduation, he was assigned to the Santa Fe Springs Area where he proudly served for approximately four years; and WHEREAS, Officer Giles, badge number 7403, was killed in the line of duty on August 25, 1974, while making a traffic stop shortly after 2:00 a.m. He was standing on the left side of the stopped vehicle when a passing car drifted over the edge of the roadway and struck him, killing him almost instantly. The errant driver apparently dozed off and may have been under the influence of alcohol; and WHEREAS, Officer Giles was a hardworking, dedicated officer who loved his job and enjoyed the people he worked with. He was known for his devotion to his family and his love of law enforcement; and WHEREAS, Officer Giles was admired for his hard work in the Corcoran farming community; and WHEREAS, In recognition of Officer Giles' great contributions and sacrifice in serving the California Highway Patrol and the citizens of California, it would be fitting to designate the interchange at State Routes 43 and 198 in the County of Kings in his honor; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designate the interchange at State Routes 43 and 198 in the County of Kings as the CHP Officer Keith M. Giles Memorial Interchange; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the costs of erecting the appropriate signs, including the star of the Department of the California Highway Patrol, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing these special designations, and upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.