California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR16 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/01/2015

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 16CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 86 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 1, 2015 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 25, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 20, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Wilk JANUARY 29, 2015 Relative to the Los Angeles County Sheriff's Deputy Shayne Daniel York Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 16, Wilk. Los Angeles County Sheriff's Deputy Shayne Daniel York Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of Interstate 5 in Los Angeles County as the Los Angeles County Sheriff's Deputy Shayne Daniel York Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Of all of the promises that the United States offers to its citizens, none is more precious and elusive then the right to be free from crime and violence; and WHEREAS, The men and women of law enforcement courageously undertake the unenviable task of guaranteeing the public's safety, a responsibility that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; and WHEREAS, Californians are indebted everyday to our peace officers for the great sacrifices they endure, and we pay special tribute to their bravery and dedication, and share in their pain, when one of their members is killed in the line of duty; and WHEREAS, Deputy Shayne Daniel York faithfully served the Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department as a deputy sheriff assigned to the East Facility of the Peter J. Pitchess Detention Center; and WHEREAS, Deputy York is remembered as a loving son to his father, Daniel York, mother, Patricia Steele, and stepmother, Mary York; a thoughtful sibling to his brother, Brandon York; and a treasured partner to his fiance, Jennifer Parish; and WHEREAS, Deputy York committed his life to his family and friends, and his career to the Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department and to the safety of his fellow deputies and the residents of Los Angeles County; and WHEREAS, Deputy York was loved by his family, friends, and coworkers, and had earned a reputation as a person who cared deeply for his partners and the public; and WHEREAS, On August 14, 1997, Deputy York and his fiance were at a Buena Park beauty salon when two armed men entered and attempted to rob the business and its patrons. Deputy York, his fiance, and the other patrons of the salon were ordered to lie face-down on the floor. When one of the men identified Deputy York as a law enforcement officer, he shot Deputy York in the back of the head. Deputy York died two days later, on August 16, 1997, at just 26 years of age; and WHEREAS, In recognition of Deputy York's contributions, commitment, and sacrifice during his two years as a law enforcement officer in serving and protecting the residents of Los Angeles County, it is a fitting tribute to designate a portion of Interstate 5 in Los Angeles County as the Los Angeles County Sheriff's Deputy Shayne Daniel York Memorial Highway; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of Interstate 5 between Newhall Ranch Road and Hasley Canyon Road in Los Angeles County as the Los Angeles County Sheriff's Deputy Shayne Daniel York Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.