Assembly | 08/05/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/02/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4730.) | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5477.) | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | Introduced. To print. |