California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR162 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 30, 2016

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2016

Chaptered

Bill May 20, 2016

Amended

Bill April 25, 2016
Bill April 7, 2016