Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 124, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4876.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4818.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
Introduced. To print. Assembly Rule 49(b) suspended.
|
|
|