Assembly | 06/06/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 58, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4051.) | ||
Senate | 05/18/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4722.) | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 3). | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | Introduced. To print. |