LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR167
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR167
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR167
Action History
Assembly
11/30/2016
From committee without further action.
Assembly
04/26/2016
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Assembly
04/25/2016
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Amended.
Assembly
04/14/2016
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Assembly
04/13/2016
From printer.
Assembly
04/12/2016
Introduced. To print.