Assembly | 06/08/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 69, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4151.) | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4781.) | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2016 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 4). | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | Introduced. To print. |