Assembly | 04/14/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 533.) | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 555.) | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 5). | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2015 | Introduced. To print. |