Assembly | 07/11/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 07/11/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4655.) | ||
Senate | 06/22/2016 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5304.) | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Introduced. To print. |