Assembly | 06/01/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 57, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3964.) | ||
Senate | 05/18/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4720.) | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28). | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2016 | Introduced. To print. |