Assembly
|
09/01/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 161, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2016
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6146.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5066.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5644.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|