California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR180 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/25/2016

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 180ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 18, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 24, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 16, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 26, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Obernolte MAY 5, 2016 Relative to the Sergeant Brian Walker Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 180, Obernolte. Sergeant Brian Walker Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 247 in the County of San Bernardino as the Sergeant Brian Walker Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Sergeant Brian L. Walker was born and raised in San Bernardino County's high desert region; and WHEREAS, Sergeant Walker attended Lucerne Valley High School, where he was an officer in the Future Farmers of America program; and WHEREAS, Sergeant Walker served as a military policeman in the United States Army assigned to the 425th Brigade Special Troops Battalion, 4th Brigade Combat Team (Airborne), 25th Infantry Division; and WHEREAS, Six days after arriving for his second deployment in the Middle East, Sergeant Walker was tragically killed in Afghanistan on May 13, 2012, when a vehicle under his command was hit with an improvised explosive device, killing him and the driver of the vehicle, Private First Class Richard L. McNulty III; and WHEREAS, Naming a highway is but a small way to honor the bravery of Sergeant Walker, who made the ultimate sacrifice so that we may enjoy the freedoms of this great nation; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 247 in the County of San Bernardino, beginning at the intersection of State Highway Route 247 and Allen Way at postmile 44.366 and continuing to Camp Rock Road at postmile 39.598, as the Sergeant Brian Walker Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of erecting the appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.