California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR180 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 5, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 1, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill May 26, 2016