California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR184 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 10, 2016

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 11, 2016

Amended

Bill June 6, 2016
Bill May 16, 2016