Assembly | 08/16/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4879.) | ||
Senate | 08/03/2016 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5481.) | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2016 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2016 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2016 | Introduced. To print. |