California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR191 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/01/2016

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 191CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 163 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 17, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 23, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 15, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gallagher (Coauthor: Assembly Member Dodd) (Coauthor: Senator Nielsen) MAY 27, 2016 Relative to the National Purple Heart Trail. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 191, Gallagher. National Purple Heart Trail. This measure would designate the portions of State Highway Routes 16, 20, and 45 in the County of Colusa for inclusion in the National Purple Heart Trail. The measure would also request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost for the installation and maintenance of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs. WHEREAS, The National Purple Heart Trail was established in 1992 for the purpose of commemorating and honoring men and women who have been wounded or killed in combat while serving in the United States Armed Forces; and WHEREAS, The National Purple Heart Trail courses its way across the vast majority of the United States; and WHEREAS, In 2001, pursuant to the Senate Concurrent Resolution 14, the Legislature designated portions of Interstate Highway Routes 5 and 80 as California's selections for inclusion in the National Purple Heart Trail; and WHEREAS, In 2009, pursuant to Assembly Concurrent Resolution 12, the Legislature designated a certain portion of State Highway Route 101 in the Counties of Monterey, San Luis Obispo, and Santa Barbara for inclusion in the National Purple Heart Trail, and, pursuant to Senate Concurrent Resolution 105, the Legislature designated a certain portion of State Highway Route 223 in the County of Kern for inclusion in the National Purple Heart Trail; and WHEREAS, In 2013, pursuant to Senate Concurrent Resolution 27, the Legislature designated certain portions of State Highway Route 101 in the Counties of Santa Barbara and Ventura for inclusion in the National Purple Heart Trail; and WHEREAS, the County of Colusa Veterans Tribute Wall was erected and dedicated on Veterans Day 2014 to recognize the honorable service and sacrifices made by all veterans who have lived, or do now reside, in the County of Colusa; and WHEREAS, the County of Colusa Veterans Tribute Wall is located at the junction of State Highways 20 and 45, and is accessible via all state highways within the County of Colusa; and WHEREAS, The Legislature finds that it is appropriate to designate additional portions of the state highway system for inclusion in the National Purple Heart Trail in order to honor the men and women who have been wounded or killed in combat while serving in the United States Armed Forces; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portions of State Highway Routes 16, 20, and 45 in the County of Colusa for inclusion in the National Purple Heart Trail; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost of installation and maintenance of appropriate signs, which shall include the National Purple Heart Trail logo, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, to determine the appropriate sign locations and erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.